TN SB0272 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 665
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 665
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires a person to establish proof of United States citizenship; lawful permanent resident status; or, in the case of a temporary driver license, a specified period of authorized stay in the United States, if the person, for purposes of obtaining a Tennessee driver license, presents a driver license from another state that issues driver licenses to illegal aliens. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 50.
Title
As enacted, requires a person to establish proof of United States citizenship; lawful permanent resident status; or, in the case of a temporary driver license, a specified period of authorized stay in the United States, if the person, for purposes of obtaining a Tennessee driver license, presents a driver license from another state that issues driver licenses to illegal aliens. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 50.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-13 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - Senate - SENATE TRANSPORTATION AND SAFETY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 6, Nays 1 PNV 0 (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - Senate - SENATE TRANSPORTATION AND SAFETY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 6, Nays 1 PNV 0 (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-17 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 665 | |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/28/2018 |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 1 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/13/2018 |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 3/13/2018 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/6/2018 |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee Ayes 6, Nays 1 PNV 0 |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 2/27/2017 |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Rule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S. Transportation & Safety Comm. 2-27-17 |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Transportation and Safety Committee to 2/27/2017 |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 2/22/2017 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0222 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-17 - Pub. Ch. 665