TN SB0253 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, phases out the professional privilege tax over a four-year period for tax years that begin on and after June 1, 2019. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 17.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, phases out the professional privilege tax over a four-year period for tax years that begin on and after June 1, 2019. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 17.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-26SenateAssigned to General Subcommittee of Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee
2019-03-19SenatePlaced on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 3/26/2019
2019-03-19SenateAction deferred in Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee to 3/26/2019
2019-03-12SenatePlaced on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 3/19/2019
2019-03-12SenateAction deferred in Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee to 3/19/2019
2019-03-05SenatePlaced on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 3/12/2019
2019-02-05SenateRefer to Senate F,W&M Revenue Subcommittee
2019-01-31SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2019-01-30SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-01-29SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0246 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-24 - Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/29/2019

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback