TN SB0253 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 29 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-17 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-17 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires persons under 18 to successfully complete a state approved motorcycle rider training course prior to obtaining a motorcycle driver license or motorcycle learner's permit. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 50, Part 1 and Title 55, Chapter 51, Part 1.
Title
As introduced, requires persons under 18 to successfully complete a state approved motorcycle rider training course prior to obtaining a motorcycle driver license or motorcycle learner's permit. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 50, Part 1 and Title 55, Chapter 51, Part 1.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Green [R] | Rep. Joe Pitts [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-17 | Senate | Withdrawn. |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Recalled from S. T&S Comm. |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. T&S Comm. |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Placed on S. Trans & Safety Comm. cal. for 3/20/2013 |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Action Def. in S. Trans & Safety Comm. to 3/20/2013 |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Placed on S. Trans & Safety Comm. cal. for 3/13/2013 |
2013-01-31 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. Trans Comm. |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0428 (Crossfiled) 2013-03-20 - Failed In s/c Transportation Subcommittee of Transportation Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB0253&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/SB0253.pdf |