TN SB0251 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-02 - Pub. Ch. 291
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-02 - Pub. Ch. 291
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, enacts the "Archival Protection Act of 2009" to urge preservation of historically significant personal property located in public schools that have been closed. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
As enacted, enacts the "Archival Protection Act of 2009" to urge preservation of historically significant personal property located in public schools that have been closed. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-05-04 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-28 - Senate - S. ED. COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-28 - Senate - S. ED. COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-02 | Pub. Ch. 291 | |
2009-06-02 | Effective date(s) 07/01/09 | |
2009-05-27 | Signed by Governor. | |
2009-05-21 | Transmitted to Gov. for action. | |
2009-05-21 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2009-05-19 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2009-05-19 | Enrolled and ready for signatures | |
2009-05-18 | Passed H., Ayes 98, Nays 0 | |
2009-05-18 | Subst. for comp. HB. | |
2009-05-07 | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. | |
2009-05-04 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House | |
2009-05-04 | Passed S., Ayes 31, Nays 0 | |
2009-04-30 | Placed on Sen. Consent Calendar (2) cal. for 05/04/2009 | |
2009-04-28 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm. | |
2009-04-23 | Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 04/28/2009 | |
2009-04-21 | Action Def. in S. Ed. Comm. to 4/28/2009 | |
2009-04-16 | Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 04/21/2009 | |
2009-04-14 | Action Def. in S. Ed. Comm. to 4/21/2009 | |
2009-04-09 | Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 04/14/2009 | |
2009-02-11 | P2C, ref. to S. Ed. Comm. | |
2009-02-09 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-05 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0375 (Crossfiled) 2009-06-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 291