TN HB0375 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 291
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 291
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, enacts the "Archival Protection Act of 2009" to urge preservation of historically significant personal property located in public schools that have been closed. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
As enacted, enacts the "Archival Protection Act of 2009" to urge preservation of historically significant personal property located in public schools that have been closed. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Coley [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-02 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 291 | |
2009-05-18 | Comp. SB subst. | |
2009-05-12 | Placed on Consent Calendar for 5/18/2009 | |
2009-05-06 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 05/12/2009 | |
2009-05-05 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2009-04-29 | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 05/05/2009 | |
2009-04-29 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2009-04-28 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 04/29/2009 | |
2009-04-28 | Re-referred To: Budget of FW&M | |
2009-04-22 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 04/28/2009 | |
2009-04-15 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2009-04-08 | Placed on cal. Education Committee for 04/15/2009 | |
2009-04-08 | Action Def. in Education Committee to 4/15/2009 | |
2009-04-01 | Placed on cal. Education Committee for 04/08/2009 | |
2009-04-01 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Education Committee | |
2009-03-25 | Placed on s/c cal K-12 of ED for 04/01/2009 | |
2009-03-25 | Action Def. in s/c K-12 of ED to 4/1/2009 | |
2009-03-18 | Placed on s/c cal K-12 of ED for 03/25/2009 | |
2009-03-18 | Action Def. in s/c K-12 of ED to 3/25/2009 | |
2009-03-11 | Placed on s/c cal K-12 of ED for 03/18/2009 | |
2009-02-25 | Assigned to s/c K-12 of ED | |
2009-02-11 | P2C, ref. to Education | |
2009-02-09 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-06 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0251 (Crossfiled) 2009-06-02 - Pub. Ch. 291
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0375&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB0375.pdf |