TN SB0243 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 31 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-31 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 31 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-31 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the department of agriculture to create standards for honey. - Amends TCA Title 43; Title 44, Chapter 15, Part 1 and Title 47, Chapter 18.
Title
As introduced, requires the department of agriculture to create standards for honey. - Amends TCA Title 43; Title 44, Chapter 15, Part 1 and Title 47, Chapter 18.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-31 | Withdrawn. | |
2011-03-31 | Recalled from S. C,L&A Comm. | |
2011-02-09 | P2C, ref. to S. C,L&A Comm. | |
2011-02-07 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-01-27 | Filed for intro. |
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB0243&ga=107 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/107/Bill/SB0243.pdf |