TN SB0227 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-16 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-16 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires, beginning with the 2022-2023 school year, each local education agency and public charter school to provide students with age-appropriate and grade-appropriate instruction on firearm safety. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, Chapter 6, relative to firearm safety instruction.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-16 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/16/2022 |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/31/2021 |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0103 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-15 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Education Instruction Subcommittee of Education Instruction