TN HB0103 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-15 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Education Instruction Subcommittee of Education Instruction
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-15 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Education Instruction Subcommittee of Education Instruction
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires, beginning with the 2022-2023 school year, each local education agency and public charter school to provide students with age-appropriate and grade-appropriate instruction on firearm safety. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, Chapter 6, relative to firearm safety instruction.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Education Instruction Subcommittee of Education Instruction |
2022-03-09 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Instruction Subcommittee for 3/15/2022 |
2022-03-08 | House | Action Def. in s/c Education Instruction Subcommittee to 3/15/2022 |
2022-03-02 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Instruction Subcommittee for 3/8/2022 |
2022-03-01 | House | Def. to Special Calendar to be Published with Final Calendar in Education Instruction Subcommittee |
2022-02-23 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Instruction Subcommittee for 3/1/2022 |
2021-03-30 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Education Instruction Subcommittee of Education Instruction |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Instruction Subcommittee for 3/30/2021 |
2021-03-23 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Education Instruction Subcommittee of Education Instruction |
2021-03-23 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Instruction Subcommittee for 3/23/2021 |
2021-03-02 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Education Instruction Subcommittee of Education Instruction |
2021-02-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Instruction Subcommittee for 3/2/2021 |
2021-01-27 | House | Assigned to s/c Education Instruction Subcommittee |
2021-01-13 | House | Ref. to Education Instruction |
2021-01-13 | House | P2C held on desk. |
2021-01-12 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-01-06 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0227 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-16 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee