TN SB0210 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-21 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce & Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires the state group health insurance program to cover hypofractionate proton therapy for treating cancer under certain conditions. - Amends TCA Title 8; Title 56 and Title 71.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, requires the state group health insurance program to cover hypofractionate proton therapy for treating cancer under certain conditions. - Amends TCA Title 8; Title 56 and Title 71.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-21SenateAssigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce & Labor Committee
2017-02-14SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2017-02-02SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
2017-02-01SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2017-01-30SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0883 (Crossfiled) 2017-03-29 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee of Insurance and Banking Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback