TN SB0209 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-04 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 9
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-04 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 9
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes private employers to give hiring preference to honorably discharged veterans, spouses of veterans with service-connected disabilities, unremarried widows or widowers of veterans who died of service-connected disabilities, and unremarried widows or widowers of members of the military who died in the line of duty. - Amends TCA Title 50, Chapter 1, Part 1.
Title
As enacted, authorizes private employers to give hiring preference to honorably discharged veterans, spouses of veterans with service-connected disabilities, unremarried widows or widowers of veterans who died of service-connected disabilities, and unremarried widows or widowers of members of the military who died in the line of duty. - Amends TCA Title 50, Chapter 1, Part 1.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Green [R] | Sen. Rusty Crowe [R] | Sen. Dolores Gresham [R] | Sen. Mark Norris [R] |
Sen. Reginald Tate [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-07 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-04 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 9 | |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/13/2017 |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/7/2017 |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 3/7/2017 |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 2/28/2017 |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 2/28/2017 |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 2/14/2017 |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0165 (Crossfiled) 2017-04-04 - Pub. Ch. 9