TN SB0206 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Pub. Ch. 301
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, abolishes the $1,000 privilege tax to the state, $1,000 privilege tax to the county, and, if applicable, $1,000 privilege tax to the municipality in which a manufacturing plant is located that must be paid by a manufacturer of alcoholic drinks and solids, other than beer, capable of being consumed by human beings. - Amends TCA Title 57.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, abolishes the $1,000 privilege tax to the state, $1,000 privilege tax to the county, and, if applicable, $1,000 privilege tax to the municipality in which a manufacturing plant is located that must be paid by a manufacturer of alcoholic drinks and solids, other than beer, capable of being consumed by human beings. - Amends TCA Title 57.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 78 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13 Pub. Ch. 301
2019-05-13 Effective date(s) 05/08/2019
2019-05-08SenateSigned by Governor.
2019-04-30SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2019-04-29HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2019-04-25SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2019-04-24SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2019-04-22HousePassed H., Ayes 78, Nays 15, PNV 2
2019-04-22HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - HA0435)
2019-04-22HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0429)
2019-04-22HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2019-04-17HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2019-04-16SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2019-04-15SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 32, Nays 0
2019-04-15SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0254)
2019-04-12SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/15/2019
2019-04-09SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
2019-04-02SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/9/2019
2019-03-26SenateAssigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
2019-03-19SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/26/2019
2019-03-05SenateAction deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/26/2019
2019-02-26SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/5/2019
2019-01-31SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
2019-01-30SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-01-29SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1066 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-13 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 301

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback