TN SB0206 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Failed in Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee, Ayes 5, Nays 5
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, creates a Second Amendment sales tax holiday for the first weekend of September of each year; exempts firearms, ammunition, and hunting supplies. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, creates a Second Amendment sales tax holiday for the first weekend of September of each year; exempts firearms, ammunition, and hunting supplies. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-15SenateFailed in Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee, Ayes 5, Nays 5
2015-04-09SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/15/2015
2015-03-24SenateRefer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee w/negative recommend
2015-03-18SenatePlaced on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 3/24/2015
2015-02-19SenateRefer to Senate Revenue Subcommittee
2015-02-11SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2015-02-09SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2015-01-29SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0239 (Crossfiled) 2015-04-21 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback