TN HB0239 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-21 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, creates a Second Amendment sales tax holiday for the first weekend of September of each year; exempts firearms, ammunition, and hunting supplies. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, creates a Second Amendment sales tax holiday for the first weekend of September of each year; exempts firearms, ammunition, and hunting supplies. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-21HouseTaken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2015-04-17HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/21/2015
2015-03-25HousePlaced behind the budget
2015-03-18HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/25/2015
2015-02-11HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
2015-02-11HouseP2C, ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2015-02-09HouseIntro., P1C.
2015-02-03HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB0206 (Crossfiled) 2015-04-15 - Failed in Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee, Ayes 5, Nays 5

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback