TN SB0203 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-18 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Energy, Ag., & NR Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, expands eligibility for sport hunting and fishing licenses without payment of a fee to all persons with a service-connected disability instead of only those persons having a service-connected disability of 30 percent or more that was acquired during war. - Amends TCA Title 70.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, expands eligibility for sport hunting and fishing licenses without payment of a fee to all persons with a service-connected disability instead of only those persons having a service-connected disability of 30 percent or more that was acquired during war. - Amends TCA Title 70.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-18SenateAssigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Energy, Ag., & NR Committee
2015-03-11SenatePlaced on Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee calendar for 3/18/2015
2015-02-11SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee
2015-02-09SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2015-01-28SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0492 (Crossfiled) 2015-03-17 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee of Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback