TN SB0199 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-22 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-22 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, changes from no later than October 1 of each year to no later than October 15 of each year in which an LEA in which one or more charter school operates must catalog all underutilized or vacant property owned or operated by the LEA or that is within any educational facility owned or operated by the LEA. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, relative to education.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-22 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/22/2023 |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/22/2023 |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/15/2023 |
2023-01-21 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-01-17 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0439 (Crossfiled) 2023-03-21 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c K-12 Subcommittee of Education Administration