TN SB0195 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Pub. Ch. 193
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Pub. Ch. 193
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, enacts the "Proton Therapy Access Act." - Amends TCA Title 8; Title 56 and Title 71.
Title
As enacted, enacts the "Proton Therapy Access Act." - Amends TCA Title 8; Title 56 and Title 71.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-10 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-01 | Pub. Ch. 193 | |
2019-05-01 | Effective date(s) 01/01/2020 | |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2019-04-15 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2019-04-10 | House | Passed H., Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2019-04-10 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0068) |
2019-04-10 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2019-04-08 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 27, Nays 1 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0089) |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 2 - SA0172) |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/4/2019 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/26/2019 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 3/26/2019 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/19/2019 |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0184 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 193