TN SB0195 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-19 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, increases, from five percent to seven percent, the cap on hotel taxes in municipalities that have adopted home rule. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 14.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, increases, from five percent to seven percent, the cap on hotel taxes in municipalities that have adopted home rule. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 14.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-02-19SenateAssigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State & Local Government Committee
2015-02-11SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
2015-02-09SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2015-01-28SenateFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback