TN SB0165 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-12 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-12 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, converts special purpose boat dealer plates to boat transport plates; authorizes persons or businesses that transport boats for hire to be issued special purpose boat transport plates in addition to manufacturers and dealers of boats. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 4, Part 2.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 55, Chapter 4, Part 2, relative to registration of boat trailers.
Sponsors
Sen. Jon Lundberg [R] | Sen. Mike Bell [R] | Sen. Bill Powers [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-25 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - TRANSPORTATION AND SAFETY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - TRANSPORTATION AND SAFETY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-12 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2021 | |
2021-04-12 | Pub. Ch. 97 | |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2021-03-30 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2021-03-25 | House | Passed H., Ayes 89, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2021-03-25 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0010) |
2021-03-25 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-18 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0057) |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/15/2021 |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/10/2021 |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee |
2021-01-15 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0107 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-12 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 97