TN SB0150 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-01-31 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, enacts the "Tennessee Bullion Depository Act." - Amends TCA Title 8; Title 9; Title 45; Title 47; Title 48 and Title 67.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 8; Title 9; Title 45; Title 47; Title 48 and Title 67, relative to depositories.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-01-31SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2023-01-20SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
2023-01-12SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2023-01-11SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1480 (Crossfiled) 2023-02-07 - Assigned to s/c Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback