TN HB1480 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-11 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-11 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the "Tennessee Bullion Depository Act." - Amends TCA Title 8; Title 9; Title 45; Title 47; Title 48 and Title 67.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 8; Title 9; Title 45; Title 47; Title 48 and Title 67, relative to depositories.
Sponsors
Rep. Bud Hulsey [R] | Rep. Monty Fritts [R] | Rep. Ed Butler [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-11 | House | Withdrawn. |
2023-03-21 | House | Def. to First Calendar of 2024 |
2023-03-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee for 3/21/2023 |
2023-03-07 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-02-17 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee |
2023-02-02 | House | P2C, ref. to Commerce Committee-- Government Operations for Review |
2023-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-01-31 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0150 (Crossfiled) 2023-03-14 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee