TN SB0142 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 336
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 336
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, extends the department of education to June 30, 2022; requires the department to appear before sunset review committee in 2019 to discuss progress made in addressing findings in its 2018 audit. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 4, Chapter 3.
Title
As enacted, extends the department of education to June 30, 2022; requires the department to appear before sunset review committee in 2019 to discuss progress made in addressing findings in its 2018 audit. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 4, Chapter 3.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-24 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - SENATE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - SENATE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-15 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 336 | |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 4/24/2019 |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 4/17/2019 |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0474 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-15 - Pub. Ch. 336