TN SB0137 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-03 - Pub. Ch. 63
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-03 - Pub. Ch. 63
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, clarifies that financial records for income verification and information concerning disabilities submitted for the purposes of the property tax relief or property tax freeze programs are confidential. - Amends TCA Section 67-5-701; Section 67-5-703; Section 67-5-704 and Section 67-5-705.
Title
As enacted, clarifies that financial records for income verification and information concerning disabilities submitted for the purposes of the property tax relief or property tax freeze programs are confidential. - Amends TCA Section 67-5-701; Section 67-5-703; Section 67-5-704 and Section 67-5-705.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-14 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - Senate - S. S&L GOVT. COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - Senate - S. S&L GOVT. COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-03 | House | Pub. Ch. 63 |
2013-04-03 | House | Effective date(s) 04/01/2013 |
2013-04-01 | House | Signed by Governor. |
2013-03-20 | House | Transmitted to Gov. for action. |
2013-03-18 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2013-03-18 | House | Signed by S. Speaker |
2013-03-14 | House | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2013-03-14 | House | Passed H., Ayes 93, Nays 0 |
2013-03-14 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Passed S., Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 cal. for 2/14/2013 |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Rec. for pass., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 2/12/2013 |
2013-01-30 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm. |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2013-01-25 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0650 (Crossfiled) 2013-04-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 63