TN SB0132 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-07 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-07 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, deletes obsolete ignition interlock program development fee. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 54; Title 55 and Title 67.
Title
As introduced, deletes obsolete ignition interlock program development fee. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 54; Title 55 and Title 67.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Tracy [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-25 - Senate - SENATE TRANSPORTATION AND SAFETY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-07 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/7/2015 |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee to 4/7/2015 |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/1/2015 |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways & Means until 4/1/2015 |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/31/2015 |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/25/2015 |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Rule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S. Trans & Safety Comm. 3/25/14 |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Rule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in Senate Transportation & Safety Committee for 3/25/2015 |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee |
2015-01-17 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2015-01-16 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0182 (Crossfiled) 2015-04-08 - Taken off notice for cal. in Transportation Committee