TN SB0127 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-13 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-13 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits state and local governments from taking discriminatory action against a business based on that business's internal policies. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 48; Title 61; Title 62 and Title 67.
Title
As introduced, prohibits state and local governments from taking discriminatory action against a business based on that business's internal policies. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 48; Title 61; Title 62 and Title 67.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-09 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 6, Nays 1 PNV 2 (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 6, Nays 1 PNV 2 (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-13 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 25, Nays 5, PNV 3 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 3 - SA0043) |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/9/2017 |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Recalled from Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 6, Nays 1 PNV 2 |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 2/28/2017 |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Rule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S&L Govt. Comm. 2-28-17 |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 2 - SA0020) |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Refer to Senate State & Local Govt. Comm. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 2/23/2017 |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 2/23/2017 |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 2/16/2017 |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 2/16/2017 |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 2/15/2017 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 2/15/2017 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0005) |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 2/13/2017 |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 2/7/2017 |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0054 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-28 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c State Government Subcommittee of State Government Committee