TN SB0118 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-02 - Pub. Ch. 577
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, creates the medical cannabis commission; exempts from the definition of marijuana oil containing the substance cannabidiol, with less than 0.9% of THC for use by a person with certain health issues, if certain other requirements met. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29; Title 4, Chapter 3; Title 38, Chapter 3; Title 39, Chapter 17; Title 43; Title 50; Title 53; Title 63; Title 67 and Title 68.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4, Chapter 29; Title 4, Chapter 3; Title 38, Chapter 3; Title 39, Chapter 17; Title 43; Title 50; Title 53; Title 63; Title 67 and Title 68, relative to the regulation of cannabis for medical use.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-05 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 74 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR MOTION TO CONSIDER AMENDMENT # 2 BY CLEMMONS PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 26 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-04 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 3 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt Amend# 5 by Watson (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 6, Nays 3 PNV 0 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - SENATE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Refer to Senate Judiciary Committee with negative recommendation (Y: 3 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-02 Pub. Ch. 577
2021-06-02 Effective date(s) 05/27/2021
2021-05-27SenateSigned by Governor.
2021-05-17SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2021-05-13HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2021-05-13SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2021-05-11SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2021-05-05HousePassed H., Ayes 74, Nays 17, PNV 1
2021-05-05HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0468)
2021-05-05HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2021-05-05HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2021-05-04SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2021-05-04SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 20, Nays 12
2021-05-04SenateAmendment withdrawn. (Amendment 4 - SA0328)
2021-05-04SenateAmendment withdrawn. (Amendment 3 - SA0035)
2021-05-04SenateAmendment withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - SA0033)
2021-05-04SenateAmendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0032)
2021-05-04SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 5 - SA0455)
2021-05-04SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar 2 for 5/4/2021
2021-05-04SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 3 PNV 0
2021-05-03SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/4/2021
2021-05-03SenateAction deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 5/4/2021
2021-04-29SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/3/2021
2021-04-28SenateAction deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 5/3/2021
2021-04-28SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/28/2021
2021-04-27SenateAction deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/28/2021
2021-04-22SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/27/2021
2021-04-22SenateRule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S. FW&M Comm. 4/27/21
2021-04-14SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 6, Nays 3 PNV 0
2021-04-14SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/14/2021
2021-04-13SenateAction deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/14/2021
2021-04-07SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/13/2021
2021-03-03SenateRefer to Senate Judiciary Committee, as amended, with negative recommendation
2021-02-24SenatePlaced on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 3/3/2021
2021-02-24SenateAction deferred in Senate Government Operations Committee to 3/3/2021
2021-02-17SenatePlaced on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 2/24/2021
2021-02-10SenatePlaced on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 2/17/2021
2021-01-15SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee
2021-01-14SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2021-01-13SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0490 (Crossfiled) 2021-06-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 577

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB0118&ga=112
Texthttps://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/112/Bill/SB0118.pdf
Texthttps://publications.tnsosfiles.com/acts/112/pub/pc0577.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/112/Amend/SA0032.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/112/Amend/SA0033.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/112/Amend/SA0035.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/112/Amend/SA0328.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/112/Amend/SA0455.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/112/Fiscal/SB0118.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/112/Fiscal/FM0041.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/112/Fiscal/FM0059.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/112/Fiscal/FM0053.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/112/Fiscal/FM1171.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/112/Fiscal/FM1322.pdf
Roll Callhttps://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB0118&ga=112

Bill Comments

feedback