TN HB0490 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 577
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 577
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, creates the medical cannabis commission; exempts from the definition of marijuana oil containing the substance cannabidiol, with less than 0.9% of THC for use by a person with certain health issues, if certain other requirements met. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29; Title 4, Chapter 3; Title 38, Chapter 3; Title 39, Chapter 17; Title 43; Title 50; Title 53; Title 63; Title 67 and Title 68.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4, Chapter 29; Title 4, Chapter 3; Title 38, Chapter 3; Title 39, Chapter 17; Title 43; Title 50; Title 53; Title 63; Title 67 and Title 68, relative to the regulation of cannabis for medical use.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-02 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 577 | |
2021-05-05 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2021-05-05 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-05-04 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 5/5/2021 |
2021-05-04 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 5/4/2021 |
2021-05-04 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-05-04 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 5/4/2021 |
2021-05-04 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-05-04 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-05-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 5/4/2021 |
2021-05-04 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2021-05-04 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-05-04 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 5/4/2021 |
2021-05-04 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Government Operations Committee |
2021-05-04 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 5/4/2021 |
2021-05-04 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2021-05-04 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 5/4/2021 |
2021-05-04 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Health Committee |
2021-05-03 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 5/4/2021 |
2021-05-03 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-03 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-02-10 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2021-02-10 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee-- Criminal Justice-- Government Operations for Review |
2021-02-08 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-03 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0118 (Crossfiled) 2021-06-02 - Effective date(s) 05/27/2021