TN SB0118 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-17 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 35
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-17 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 35
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, designates official Tennessee War of 1812 Bicentennial Commission.
Title
As enacted, designates official Tennessee War of 1812 Bicentennial Commission.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-05 - Senate - S. S&L GOVT. COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - Senate - S. GOVT. OPS. COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - Senate - S. GOVT. OPS. COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-17 | Senate | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 35 |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - SA0012) |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Comp. HB Subst (sends SB to dead bill file) |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 3/7/2013 |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm. |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 3/5/2013 |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S&L Gov. Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Placed on S. Govt. Ops. Comm. cal. for 2/13/2013 |
2013-01-30 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. Govt. Ops. Comm. |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0095 (Crossfiled) 2013-05-17 - Pub. Ch. 35