TN SB0114 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-02 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-02 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, creates office of solicitor general to defend and prosecute cases in the interest of the state; revises duties of attorney general and reporter. - Amends TCA Title 8.
Title
As introduced, creates office of solicitor general to defend and prosecute cases in the interest of the state; revises duties of attorney general and reporter. - Amends TCA Title 8.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-04 - Senate - S. JUD COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 4 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-02 | Withdrawn. | |
2012-02-02 | Recalled from S. Jud. Comm. | |
2011-05-04 | Failed In S. Jud Comm. Ayes 4, Nays 5 PNV 0 | |
2011-05-04 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 5/4/2011 | |
2011-05-03 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 5/4/2011 | |
2011-04-27 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 5/3/2011 | |
2011-04-27 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 5/4/2011 | |
2011-04-27 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 4/27/2011 | |
2011-04-26 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 4/27/2011 | |
2011-04-20 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 4/26/2011 | |
2011-04-05 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 4/12/2011 | |
2011-03-30 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 4/5/2011 | |
2011-03-29 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 4/5/2011 | |
2011-03-23 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 3/29/2011 | |
2011-03-15 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 3/29/2011 | |
2011-03-09 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 3/15/2011 | |
2011-02-09 | P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm. | |
2011-02-07 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-01-24 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0285 (Crossfiled) 2011-04-27 - Action Def. in s/c Judiciary Subcommittee to 4/27/2011