TN HB0285 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-27 - Action Def. in s/c Judiciary Subcommittee to 4/27/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-27 - Action Def. in s/c Judiciary Subcommittee to 4/27/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, creates office of solicitor general to defend and prosecute cases in the interest of the state; revises duties of attorney general and reporter. - Amends TCA Title 8.
Title
As introduced, creates office of solicitor general to defend and prosecute cases in the interest of the state; revises duties of attorney general and reporter. - Amends TCA Title 8.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-27 | Action Def. in s/c Judiciary Subcommittee to 4/27/2011 | |
2011-04-21 | Placed on s/c cal Judiciary Subcommittee for 4/27/2011 | |
2011-04-20 | Action Def. in s/c Judiciary Subcommittee to 4/27/2011 | |
2011-04-14 | Placed on s/c cal Judiciary Subcommittee for 4/20/2011 | |
2011-04-13 | Action Def. in s/c Judiciary Subcommittee to 4/20/2011 | |
2011-04-06 | Placed on s/c cal Judiciary Subcommittee for 4/13/2011 | |
2011-02-10 | Assigned to s/c General Sub of Judiciary | |
2011-02-09 | P2C, ref. to Judiciary Committee | |
2011-02-07 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-02-03 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0114 (Crossfiled) 2012-02-02 - Withdrawn.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0285&ga=107 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/107/Bill/HB0285.pdf |