TN SB0112 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Effective date(s) 7/1/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Effective date(s) 7/1/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, clarifies that a lienor is required to send notice of a discharged lien to the department of revenue on the date the lien is discharged and that the department must be notified of the discharge within 72 hours of the date of discharge. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 3.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 55, Chapter 3, relative to liens.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-12 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - TRANSPORTATION AND SAFETY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - TRANSPORTATION AND SAFETY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-04 | Effective date(s) 7/1/2021 | |
2021-05-04 | Pub. Ch. 240 | |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2021-04-21 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2021-04-12 | House | Passed H., Ayes 91, Nays 2, PNV 0 |
2021-04-12 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2021-03-18 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 3/15/2021 |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/10/2021 |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee |
2021-01-13 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0331 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-04 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 240