TN SB0106 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-01-20 - Passed on Second Consideration, held on desk. Local Bill
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-01-20 - Passed on Second Consideration, held on desk. Local Bill
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Subject to local approval, changes the dates for elections for mayor and councilman from the first Saturday in December in odd-numbered years to the third Thursday in August in even-numbered years. - Amends Chapter 121 of the Private Acts of 2004; as amended.
Title
AN ACT to amend Chapter 121 of the Private Acts of 2004; as amended by Chapter 84 of the Private Acts of 2014; and any other acts amendatory thereto, relative to the charter of Ashland City.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-20 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, held on desk. Local Bill |
2023-01-12 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-01-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0083 (Crossfiled) 2023-02-21 - Taken off notice for cal. in Local Government Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB0106&ga=113 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/113/Bill/SB0106.pdf |