TN SB0101 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Effective date(s) 04/20/2021, 07/01/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Effective date(s) 04/20/2021, 07/01/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, creates the professional art therapist advisory committee of the board of examiners in psychology to regulate the practice of art therapy. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29, Part 2 and Title 63.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4, Chapter 29, Part 2 and Title 63, relative to art therapy.
Sponsors
Sen. Becky Massey [R] | Sen. Art Swann [R] | Sen. Raumesh Akbari [D] | Sen. Sara Kyle [D] |
Sen. Edward Jackson [R] | Sen. Paul Rose [R] | Sen. Heidi Campbell [D] | Sen. Page Walley [R] |
Sen. Jeff Yarbro [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-05 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 81 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - SENATE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee Ayes 5, Nays 2 PNV 2 (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - SENATE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee Ayes 5, Nays 2 PNV 2 (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-03 | Effective date(s) 04/20/2021, 07/01/2022 | |
2021-05-03 | Pub. Ch. 160 | |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2021-04-09 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-04-05 | House | Passed H., Ayes 81, Nays 7, PNV 1 |
2021-04-05 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - HA0013) |
2021-04-05 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0012) |
2021-04-05 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2021-03-22 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 30, Nays 2 |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 2 - SA0050) |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0018) |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/18/2021 |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/10/2021 |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 3/10/2021 |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/3/2021 |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee Ayes 5, Nays 2 PNV 2 |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 2/24/2021 |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 2/17/2021 |
2021-01-13 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0183 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 160