TN SB0086 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-18 - Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/18/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, institutes Tennessee small business sales tax holiday program. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, institutes Tennessee small business sales tax holiday program. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-18SenatePlaced on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/18/2013
2013-04-17SenateAction Def. in S. F,W&M Comm. to 4/18/2014
2013-04-17SenatePlaced on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/17/2013
2013-04-16SenateAction Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 4/17/2013
2013-04-16SenatePlaced on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/16/2013
2013-04-15SenateAction Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 4/16/2013
2013-04-12SenatePlaced on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/15/2013
2013-04-11SenateAction Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 4/15/2013
2013-04-10SenatePlaced on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/11/2013
2013-04-10SenateAction Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 4/11/2013
2013-04-09SenatePlaced on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/10/2013
2013-04-09SenateAction Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 4/10/2013
2013-04-08SenatePlaced on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/9/2013
2013-04-08SenateAction Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 4/9/2013
2013-04-03SenatePlaced on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/8/2013
2013-03-18SenateRec. for pass; ref to S. FW&M with no recomendation
2013-03-13SenatePlaced on S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M. cal. for 3/18/2013
2013-03-05SenateAction Def. in S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M. to 3/12/2013
2013-03-04SenatePlaced on S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M. cal. for 3/5/2013
2013-02-04SenateRef. to S. Tax Sub Comm.
2013-01-30SenateP2C, ref. to S. FW&M Comm.
2013-01-28SenateIntro., P1C.
2013-01-22SenateFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

HB0289 (Crossfiled) 2014-04-14 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback