TN HB0289 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-14 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-14 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, institutes Tennessee small business sales tax holiday program. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6.
Title
As introduced, institutes Tennessee small business sales tax holiday program. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-14 | House | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2014-04-09 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/9/2014 |
2014-03-19 | House | Placed Behind the Budget |
2014-03-12 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/19/2014 |
2013-04-18 | House | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2013-04-18 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/18/2013 |
2013-04-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/17/2013 |
2013-03-06 | House | Placed Behind the Budget |
2013-02-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/6/2013 |
2013-02-27 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 3/6/2013 |
2013-02-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 2/27/2013 |
2013-02-04 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2013-01-31 | House | P2C, ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2013-01-30 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2013-01-29 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0086 (Crossfiled) 2013-04-18 - Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/18/2013
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0289&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/HB0289.pdf |