TN SB0083 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-12 - Failed in Senate Judiciary Committee - no motion
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-12 - Failed in Senate Judiciary Committee - no motion
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, expands burglary to include entering a construction site with intent to commit a felony, theft, or assault or entering a construction site and committing a felony, theft, or assault; classifies the offense as a Class D felony. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 14, Part 4.
Title
As introduced, expands burglary to include entering a construction site with intent to commit a felony, theft, or assault or entering a construction site and committing a felony, theft, or assault; classifies the offense as a Class D felony. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 14, Part 4.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-12 | Senate | Failed in Senate Judiciary Committee - no motion |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/12/2019 |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0125 (Crossfiled) 2019-01-30 - Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee