TN SB0077 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State & Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State & Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, changes the definition of a "detainee day" for purposes of compensating a county for holding a state prisoner from the date the prisoner is sentenced to the department of correction to the date the prisoner is convicted by the trial court; and allows commissioner to retroactively compensate a county back to the initial date of incarceration if the trial judge grants the prisoner credit for time served and time spent in jail pending appeal. - Amends TCA Title 41, Chapter 8.
Title
As introduced, changes the definition of a "detainee day" for purposes of compensating a county for holding a state prisoner from the date the prisoner is sentenced to the department of correction to the date the prisoner is convicted by the trial court; and allows commissioner to retroactively compensate a county back to the initial date of incarceration if the trial judge grants the prisoner credit for time served and time spent in jail pending appeal. - Amends TCA Title 41, Chapter 8.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State & Local Government Committee |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Filed for introduction |