TN SB0062 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-04 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S&L Govt Com.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-04 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S&L Govt Com.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, clarifies that the duties of the Capitol Commission include establishing a policy relative to historical commemorative statues and monuments on the capitol grounds as well as on the Bicentennial Mall. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 8.
Title
As introduced, clarifies that the duties of the Capitol Commission include establishing a policy relative to historical commemorative statues and monuments on the capitol grounds as well as on the Bicentennial Mall. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 8.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-04 | Assigned to Gen. Sub of S&L Govt Com. | |
2011-02-07 | P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm. | |
2011-01-15 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-01-14 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0056 (Crossfiled) 2011-02-07 - P2C, ref. to State & Local Government Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB0062&ga=107 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/107/Bill/SB0062.pdf |