TN SB0062 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-02-11 - P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-02-11 - P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires judicial council to draft proposal reconstituting existing judicial districts by January 1, 2010, based upon population and provides that future determinations as to need for new judicial positions be based exclusively on population rather than weighted caseload formula. - Amends TCA Title 16, Chapter 2, Part 5.
Title
As introduced, requires judicial council to draft proposal reconstituting existing judicial districts by January 1, 2010, based upon population and provides that future determinations as to need for new judicial positions be based exclusively on population rather than weighted caseload formula. - Amends TCA Title 16, Chapter 2, Part 5.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-02-11 | P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm. | |
2009-02-09 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-01-28 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0318 (Crossfiled) 2009-02-17 - Assigned to s/c Civil Practice and Procedure of JUD
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB0062&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/SB0062.pdf |