TN SB0060 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-02-11 - P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-02-11 - P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires law enforcement officer to conduct test to determine blood alcohol of driver involved in accident resulting in injury or death if officer has probable cause to believe driver committed DUI, vehicular assault, vehicular homicide, or aggravated vehicular homicide. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 10, Part 4.
Title
As introduced, requires law enforcement officer to conduct test to determine blood alcohol of driver involved in accident resulting in injury or death if officer has probable cause to believe driver committed DUI, vehicular assault, vehicular homicide, or aggravated vehicular homicide. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 10, Part 4.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-02-11 | P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm. | |
2009-02-09 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-01-28 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0121 (Crossfiled) 2009-02-17 - Assigned to s/c Criminal Practice and Procedure of JUD
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB0060&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/SB0060.pdf |