TN SB0052 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-02-11 - P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-02-11 - P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the department of children's services to report to the select committee on children and youth the total number of adoptions, the number involving adoptive parents that are related to the child, and the number involving adoptive parents that are not related to the child each year. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 36; Title 39; Title 67 and Title 68.
Title
As introduced, requires the department of children's services to report to the select committee on children and youth the total number of adoptions, the number involving adoptive parents that are related to the child, and the number involving adoptive parents that are not related to the child each year. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 36; Title 39; Title 67 and Title 68.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-02-11 | P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm. | |
2009-02-09 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-01-28 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0427 (Crossfiled) 2009-02-12 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB0052&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/SB0052.pdf |