TN SB0046 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-15 - Pub. Ch. 112
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-15 - Pub. Ch. 112
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, enacts the "Dynamic Accessibility Act," which provides for a modern symbol of access for disabled persons. - Amends TCA Title 3; Title 4; Title 12; Title 55 and Title 68.
Title
As enacted, enacts the "Dynamic Accessibility Act," which provides for a modern symbol of access for disabled persons. - Amends TCA Title 3; Title 4; Title 12; Title 55 and Title 68.
Sponsors
Sen. Becky Massey [R] | Sen. Dawn White [R] | Sen. Sara Kyle [D] | Sen. Jeff Yarbro [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-25 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Concur House Amendment # 1 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - TRANSPORTATION AND SAFETY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 1 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - TRANSPORTATION AND SAFETY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 1 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-15 | Pub. Ch. 112 | |
2019-04-15 | Effective date(s) 04/09/2019; 07/01/2020 | |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2019-04-01 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 32, Nays 0 (Amendment 1 - HA0043) |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar for 3/25/2019 |
2019-03-18 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 98, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2019-03-18 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0043) |
2019-03-18 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2019-02-28 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0027) |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Floor Session calendar for 2/25/2019 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 1 |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 2/20/2019 |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Transportation and Safety Committee to 2/20/2019 |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 2/13/2019 |
2019-01-19 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation & Safety Committee |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0062 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-15 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 112