TN SB0045 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 18 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Enrolled and ready for signatures
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires locally appointed commissioners to report to the county legislative body within 60 days of the completion of any repair work on bridges, levees, or causeways. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 54; Title 55 and Title 67.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, requires locally appointed commissioners to report to the county legislative body within 60 days of the completion of any repair work on bridges, levees, or causeways. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 54; Title 55 and Title 67.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2019-04-17HousePassed H., Ayes 84, Nays 12, PNV 0
2019-04-17HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0170)
2019-04-17HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2019-04-08HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2019-04-04SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2019-04-04SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 28, Nays 0
2019-04-04SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0185)
2019-04-02SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/4/2019
2019-03-28SenateRefer to Senate Calendar Committee
2019-03-28SenateRecalled from Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2019-03-27SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
2019-03-20SenatePlaced on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/27/2019
2019-03-20SenateAction deferred in Senate Transportation and Safety Committee to 3/27/2019
2019-03-13SenatePlaced on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/20/2019
2019-01-19SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-01-17SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0182 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-17 - Comp. SB subst.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback