TN SB0031 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 82
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 82
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, extends the alcoholic beverage commission to June 30, 2027; requires the commission to report back to the government operations subcommittee by December 31, 2021 for an update of the findings on the 2020 performance audit. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 57, Chapter 1.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 57, Chapter 1, relative to the alcoholic beverage commission.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-15 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - SENATE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - SENATE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-06 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 82 | |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 3/15/2021 |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 3/10/2021 |
2021-01-13 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-01-08 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0257 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-06 - Effective date(s) 03/31/2021