TN SB0021 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-25 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 246
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-25 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 246
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, designates "Benjamin C. "Pat" Hartman, Jr. Memorial Bridge" on S.R. 386 in Sumner County.
Title
As enacted, designates "Benjamin C. "Pat" Hartman, Jr. Memorial Bridge" on S.R. 386 in Sumner County.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Tracy [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-05-09 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-03 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-09 - Senate - S. T&S COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-09 - Senate - S. TRANS COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-03 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-09 - Senate - S. T&S COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-09 - Senate - S. TRANS COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-25 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 246 | |
2011-05-09 | Passed S., Ayes 33, Nays 0 | |
2011-05-09 | Comp. HB Subst (sends SB to dead bill file) | |
2011-05-06 | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 cal. for 5/9/2011 | |
2011-05-03 | Rec. for pass; ref to S. Cal. Comm. | |
2011-05-02 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 5/3/2011 | |
2011-02-09 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. FW&M Comm. | |
2011-02-03 | Placed on S. Trans Comm. cal. for 02/09/2011 | |
2011-01-15 | Ref. to S. Trans. Comm. | |
2011-01-13 | P2C, Held on desk pending committee appointments | |
2011-01-12 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-01-11 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0010 (Crossfiled) 2011-05-25 - Pub. Ch. 246