TN HB0010 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-25 - Pub. Ch. 246
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-25 - Pub. Ch. 246
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, designates "Benjamin C. "Pat" Hartman, Jr. Memorial Bridge" on S.R. 386 in Sumner County.
Title
As enacted, designates "Benjamin C. "Pat" Hartman, Jr. Memorial Bridge" on S.R. 386 in Sumner County.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-04 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-31 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Consent Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-29 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-02-22 - House - (VOICE VOTE) TRANSPORTATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-31 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Consent Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-29 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-02-22 - House - (VOICE VOTE) TRANSPORTATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-25 | Pub. Ch. 246 | |
2011-05-25 | Effective date(s) 05/23/11 | |
2011-05-23 | Signed by Governor. | |
2011-05-11 | Transmitted to Governor for his action. | |
2011-05-11 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2011-05-10 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2011-05-10 | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. | |
2011-05-09 | S. Subst. HB for comp. SB. | |
2011-04-07 | Rcvd. from H., P1C. | |
2011-04-04 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. | |
2011-04-04 | Passed H., Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 1 | |
2011-03-31 | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/4/2011 | |
2011-03-30 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/31/2011 | |
2011-03-29 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2011-03-23 | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 3/29/2011 | |
2011-02-22 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2011-02-16 | Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 2/22/2011 | |
2011-01-13 | Ref. to Transportation Committee | |
2011-01-12 | P2C held on desk pending the appointment of standing committees. | |
2011-01-11 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-01-10 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0021 (Crossfiled) 2011-05-25 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 246