TN SB0016 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-4)
Status: Passed on June 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 503
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, authorizes the TBI to employ, effective July 1, 2015, four additional special agents for the purpose of training other officers, investigating and assisting in the prosecution of human trafficking cases; directs TBI to develop and provide a course of instruction to other officers and departments in the recognition, detection, and prosecution of human trafficking cases. - Amends TCA Title 38, Chapter 6.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, authorizes the TBI to employ, effective July 1, 2015, four additional special agents for the purpose of training other officers, investigating and assisting in the prosecution of human trafficking cases; directs TBI to develop and provide a course of instruction to other officers and departments in the recognition, detection, and prosecution of human trafficking cases. - Amends TCA Title 38, Chapter 6.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-03 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 503
2015-04-23SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2015-04-22SenateCompanion House Bill substituted
2015-04-20SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/22/2015
2015-04-16SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2015-04-15SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2015-04-09SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/15/2015
2015-04-09SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2015-02-25SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2015-02-24SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2015-02-24SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2015-02-24SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2015-02-19SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/24/2015
2015-02-17SenateAction deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 2/24/2015
2015-02-11SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/17/2015
2015-02-05SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2015-01-17SenateRefer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2015-01-15SenatePassed on Second Consideration, held on desk pending committee appointments
2015-01-14SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2015-01-13SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0275 (Crossfiled) 2015-06-03 - Pub. Ch. 503

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback