TN HB0275 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 23-3)
Status: Passed on June 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-03 - Pub. Ch. 503
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 23-3)
Status: Passed on June 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-03 - Pub. Ch. 503
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes the TBI to employ, effective July 1, 2015, four additional special agents for the purpose of training other officers, investigating and assisting in the prosecution of human trafficking cases; directs TBI to develop and provide a course of instruction to other officers and departments in the recognition, detection, and prosecution of human trafficking cases. - Amends TCA Title 38, Chapter 6.
Title
As enacted, authorizes the TBI to employ, effective July 1, 2015, four additional special agents for the purpose of training other officers, investigating and assisting in the prosecution of human trafficking cases; directs TBI to develop and provide a course of instruction to other officers and departments in the recognition, detection, and prosecution of human trafficking cases. - Amends TCA Title 38, Chapter 6.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-03 | Pub. Ch. 503 | |
2015-06-03 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2015 | |
2015-05-20 | Signed by Governor. | |
2015-05-08 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2015-05-06 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2015-04-27 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2015-04-22 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2015-04-22 | House | Passed H., Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2015-04-22 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-04-21 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/22/2015 |
2015-04-21 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/21/2015 |
2015-04-21 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2015-04-21 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/21/2015 |
2015-04-21 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2015-04-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/21/2015 |
2015-04-01 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2015-03-25 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/1/2015 |
2015-03-24 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-03-24 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2015-03-24 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2015-03-18 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/24/2015 |
2015-03-18 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Government Committee |
2015-03-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/18/2015 |
2015-02-25 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c State Government Subcommittee of State Government Committee |
2015-02-25 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-02-24 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-02-19 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 2/25/2015 |
2015-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee |
2015-02-11 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee |
2015-02-10 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-02-09 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2015-02-03 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0016 (Crossfiled) 2015-06-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 503