TN SB0012 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-17 - Effective date(s) 05/05/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-17 - Effective date(s) 05/05/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, expands the eligibility criteria for an education savings account to include students zoned to attend an LEA with at least three schools identified as priority schools in 2015, and at least three schools identified as being in the bottom 10 percent of schools in 2017. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, Chapter 6, relative to the Tennessee Education Savings Account Pilot Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MESSAGE CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 57 N: 27 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 70 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 57 N: 35 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 19 N: 6 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 70 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 57 N: 35 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 19 N: 6 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-17 | Effective date(s) 05/05/2023 | |
2023-05-17 | Pub. Ch. 328 | |
2023-05-05 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2023-04-21 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2023-04-21 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2023-04-21 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2023-04-21 | House | Passed H., Ayes 57, Nays 27, PNV 5 |
2023-04-21 | House | Am. withdrawn. |
2023-04-21 | House | Am. reconsidered. |
2023-04-21 | House | Motion to reconsider adopted. |
2023-04-21 | House | Motion to lift from table adopted. |
2023-04-20 | House | H. Placed on Message Calendar for 4/21/2023 |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Senate refused to concur in amendment |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar for 4/20/2023 |
2023-04-19 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 57, Nays 35, PNV 4 |
2023-04-19 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0427) |
2023-04-19 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2023-02-23 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 19, Nays 6, PNV 4 |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 2/16/2023 |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 2/8/2023 |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Refer to Senate Education Committee |
2023-01-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, held on desk pending committee appointments |
2023-01-10 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-12-06 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0433 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-17 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 328