TN SB0010 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-13 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-13 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, adds the state and local government committee of the senate and the local government committee of the house of representatives to where the secretary of state files the annual consolidated report on HAVA requirements and payments. - Amends TCA Title 2.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 2, relative to elections.
Sponsors
Sen. Ken Yager [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-11-23 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0376 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-10 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.