TN SB0008 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Effective date(s) 04/20/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Effective date(s) 04/20/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises provisions governing a department, agency, or instrumentality of a participating political subdivision becoming a separate local government entity from the political subdivision. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 34; Title 8, Chapter 35; Title 8, Chapter 36 and Title 8, Chapter 37.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 8, Chapter 34; Title 8, Chapter 35; Title 8, Chapter 36 and Title 8, Chapter 37, relative to retirement.
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Bailey [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-05 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | Effective date(s) 04/20/2021 | |
2021-04-30 | Pub. Ch. 156 | |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2021-04-09 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-04-05 | House | Passed H., Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2021-04-05 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2021-03-18 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 3/15/2021 |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/9/2021 |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State & Local Government Committee |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 2/23/2021 |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 2/16/2021 |
2021-01-13 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-11-18 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0161 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-30 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 156